ME LD1170 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-02 - Ordered Sent Forthwith.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Reduce Youth Access to Tobacco Products

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Reduce Youth Access to Tobacco Products

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-08-02 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #463 (Y: 90 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2017-08-02 - Senate - Reconsideration - Veto RC #423 (Y: 29 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-06-23 - House - Acc Report 'a' Otp As Amend RC #383 (Y: 113 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-06-22 - Senate - Accept Rpt 'b' Ontp RC #370 (Y: 4 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-02HouseOrdered Sent Forthwith.
2017-08-02HouseIn concurrence. Sent to the Engrossing Department.
2017-08-02HouseROLL CALL NO. 463V 90 having voted in the affirmative and 44 in the negative, with 16 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted.
2017-08-02HouseThis Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
2017-08-02SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence
2017-08-02SenateLD 1170 In Senate, August 2, 2017, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 29 IN FAVOR and 5 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
2017-07-20SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2017-07-20HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-07-20HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2017-07-20HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-07-20HouseThe House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-146) as Amended by Senate Amendment "B" (S-306) thereto and Senate Amendment "A" (S-325).
2017-07-20SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence
2017-07-20SenatePASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-146) as Amended by Senate Amendment "B" (S-306) thereto AND Senate Amendment "A" (S-325) In NON-CONCURRENCE
2017-07-20SenateOn further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-325) READ and ADOPTED
2017-07-20SenateOn motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED
2017-07-20SenateOn Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
2017-06-27SenateOn motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending ENACTMENT in concurrence
2017-06-27HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-27HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2017-06-23HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-23HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-146) as Amended by Senate Amendment "B" (S-306) thereto.
2017-06-23HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2017-06-23HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (S-146) as Amended by Senate Amendment "B" (S-306) thereto was ADOPTED.
2017-06-23HouseSenate Amendment "B" (S-306) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-146) was READ and ADOPTED.
2017-06-23HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (S-146) was READ.
2017-06-23HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2017-06-23HouseROLL CALL NO. 383 (Yeas 113 - Nays 34 - Absent 4 - Excused 0)
2017-06-23HouseOn motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended was ACCEPTED.
2017-06-23HouseReports READ.
2017-06-22SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence
2017-06-22SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-146) as Amended by Senate Amendment "B" (S-306) thereto
2017-06-22SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-146) as Amended by Senate Amendment "B" (S-306) thereto ADOPTED
2017-06-22SenateOn motion by Senator DAVIS of Piscataquis Senate Amendment "B" (S-306) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-146) READ and ADOPTED
2017-06-22SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-146) READ
2017-06-22SenateREAD ONCE
2017-06-22SenateSubsequently The Report A Ought to Pass As Amended ACCEPTED
2017-06-22SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 370 Yeas 4 - Nays 31 - Excused 0 - Absent 0
2017-06-22SenateSubsequently Report B Ought Not To Pass FAILED
2017-06-22SenateTaken from the table by the President
2017-06-21SenateUnfinished Business
2017-06-20SenateUnfinished Business
2017-06-19SenateUnfinished Business
2017-06-16SenateUnfinished Business
2017-06-15SenateUnfinished Business
2017-06-14SenateUnfinished Business
2017-06-13SenateUnfinished Business
2017-06-12SenateUnfinished Business
2017-06-09SenateUnfinished Business
2017-06-08SenateUnfinished Business
2017-06-07SenateUnfinished Business
2017-06-06SenateUnfinished Business
2017-06-05SenateUnfinished Business
2017-06-01SenateUnfinished Business
2017-05-31SenateUnfinished Business
2017-05-30SenateUnfinished Business
2017-05-30SenateOn further motion by same Senator TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending his motion to ACCEPT Report B Ought Not to Pass,
2017-05-30SenateSenator BRAKEY of Androscoggin moved to ACCEPT Report B Ought Not to Pass.
2017-05-30SenateReports READ
2017-03-28HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-03-28HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES.
2017-03-28SenateCommittee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence

Subjects


Maine State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1170&snum=128
Texthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0391&item=1&snum=128
Texthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0391&item=8&snum=128
Texthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0391&item=2&snum=128
Texthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0391&item=6&snum=128
Texthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=SP0391&item=9&snum=128
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280064294&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=370
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280064294&chamber=House&serialnumber=383
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280064294&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=423
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280064294&chamber=House&serialnumber=463

Bill Comments

feedback