ME LD1168 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-29 - FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Improve Maine's Response to Childhood Trauma
Title
Resolve, To Improve Maine's Response to Childhood Trauma
Sponsors
Rep. Frances Head [R] | Rep. Mark Bryant [D] | Rep. Maryanne Kinney [R] | Rep. Colleen Madigan [D] |
Rep. Joyce McCreight [D] | Rep. Richard Pickett [R] | Sen. Jeffrey Timberlake [R] | Rep. William Tuell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-29 | Senate | FINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2019-05-28 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-28 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2019-05-28 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-323), in concurrence. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-323) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-23 | House | The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-323). |
2019-05-23 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-05-23 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-03-07 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2019-03-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-07 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2019-03-07 | House | Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |