ME LD1161 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Failed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Failed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Restrict the Use of Mercury in Dental Fillings in State-funded Dental Procedures
Title
An Act To Restrict the Use of Mercury in Dental Fillings in State-funded Dental Procedures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-06 - Senate - Recede And Concur RC #203 (Y: 15 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-06-05 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #180 (Y: 106 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt RC #189 (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-05 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #180 (Y: 106 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-06-04 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-a Rpt RC #189 (Y: 24 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-07 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2019-06-07 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-07 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Subsequently On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc The Senate INSISTED To Acceptance of The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report AND PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-181) |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 203 Yeas 15 - Nays 19 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Senator TIMBERLAKE of Androscoggin moved to RECEDE and CONCUR FAILED |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc moved to INSIST |
2019-06-05 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-05 | House | In NON-CONCURRENCE and sent for concurrence. |
2019-06-05 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 180 (Yeas 106 - Nays 38 - Absent 4 - Excused 2 Vacant 1) |
2019-06-05 | House | On motion of Representative HYMANSON of York, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2019-06-05 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-181) |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-181) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-06-04 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 189 Yeas 24 - Nays 11 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Subsequently The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2019-06-03 | Senate | On motion by Senator LIBBY of Androscoggin TABLED until Later in Today's Session pending motion by Senator GRATWICK of Penobscot to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report . |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Senator GRATWICK of Penobscot moved to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report . |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Reports READ |
2019-03-07 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-07 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator SANBORN, H. of Cumberland REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES suggested and ordered printed |