ME LD1161 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Insurance Laws Governing the Provision of Rebates
Title
An Act To Amend the Insurance Laws Governing the Provision of Rebates
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2017-05-18 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-18 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-05-16 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-16 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-72). |
2017-05-16 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2017-05-16 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-72) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-05-16 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2017-05-16 | House | On motion of Representative LAWRENCE of South Berwick, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-05-16 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-72) |
2017-05-11 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-72) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-05-09 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-05-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator WHITTEMORE of Somerset The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Reports READ |
2017-03-23 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-23 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-03-23 | Senate | REFERENCE to the Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Committee on INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES suggested and ordered printed |