ME LD1160 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Transfer the Kim Wallace Adaptive Equipment Loan Program Fund to the Office of the Treasurer of State
Title
An Act To Transfer the Kim Wallace Adaptive Equipment Loan Program Fund to the Office of the Treasurer of State
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-28 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2019-05-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-23 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-05-23 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-258), in concurrence. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-258) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-16 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-258). |
2019-05-16 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-05-16 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-03-12 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS in concurrence |
2019-03-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-07 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INNOVATION, DEVELOPMENT, ECONOMIC ADVANCEMENT AND BUSINESS. |
2019-03-07 | House | Committee on Innovation, Development, Economic Advancement and Business suggested and ordered printed. |