ME LD1156 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-20 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-20 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding the Board of Dental Examiners
Title
An Act Regarding the Board of Dental Examiners
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-20 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2015-05-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-05-19 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2015-05-13 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2015-05-13 | Senate | On motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass Report ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2015-05-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-05-12 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2015-05-12 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2015-05-12 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2015-05-12 | House | On motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, the Majority Ought to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2015-05-12 | House | Reports READ. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | On motion by Senator Volk of Cumberland, REFERRED to the Committee on Labor, Commerce, Research and Economic Development, in concurrence. |
2015-03-31 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-03-31 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. |
2015-03-31 | House | Committee on Labor, Commerce, Research and Economic Development suggested and ordered printed. |