ME LD1154 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-22 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-22 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Provide for the Establishment of Benefit Corporations
Title
An Act To Provide for the Establishment of Benefit Corporations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-22 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #357 (Y: 88 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2015-06-10 - House - Enactment RC #211 (Y: 122 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - House - Enactment RC #211 (Y: 122 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-22 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2015-06-22 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 357V 88 having voted in the affirmative and 56 in the negative, with 7 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become a law and the veto was sustained. |
2015-06-22 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2015-06-10 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2015-06-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-10 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 211 (Yeas 122 - Nays 23 - Absent 6 - Excused 0) |
2015-06-10 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-363), in concurrence. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-363) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2015-06-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-09 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-363) |
2015-06-09 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2015-06-09 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2015-06-09 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2015-04-02 | Senate | On motion by Senator Volk of Cumberland REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT , in concurrence. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2015-04-01 | Senate | On motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE , in concurrence. |
2015-03-31 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-03-31 | House | On motion of Representative HOBBINS of Saco, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. |
2015-03-31 | House | Committee on JUDICIARY suggested and ordered printed. |