ME LD1150 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Failed on August 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-02 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Resolve, To Establish the Commission To Study Transportation Funding Reform

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolve, To Establish the Commission To Study Transportation Funding Reform

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-02SenateIn possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
2017-06-06SenateOn motion by Senator COLLINS of York PLACED ON THE SPECIAL HIGHWAY TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE
2017-06-05HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-05HouseFINALLY PASSED.
2017-06-01SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-318) in concurrence
2017-06-01SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-318) READ and ADOPTED
2017-06-01SenateREAD ONCE
2017-06-01SenateOn motion by Senator COLLINS of York the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence
2017-06-01SenateReports Read
2017-05-31HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-05-31HouseThe Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-318).
2017-05-31HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Resolve was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2017-05-31HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-318) was READ and ADOPTED.
2017-05-31HouseThe Resolve was READ ONCE.
2017-05-31HouseOn motion of Representative McLEAN of Gorham, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2017-05-31HouseReports READ.
2017-03-28SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION in concurrence
2017-03-23HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-03-23HouseThe Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION.
2017-03-23HouseCommittee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback