ME LD1143 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on July 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-02 - in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Resolve, Providing for the Official Observance of the 200th Anniversary of the Formation of the State of Maine

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Resolve, Providing for the Official Observance of the 200th Anniversary of the Formation of the State of Maine

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-08-02 - Senate - Reconsideration - Veto RC #434 (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-08-02 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #448 (Y: 110 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-02Senatein concurrence
2017-08-02SenateLD 1143 In Senate, August 2, 2017, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 32 IN FAVOR and 0 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill become law and the VETO was OVERRIDDEN.
2017-08-02HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-08-02HouseROLL CALL NO. 448V 110 having voted in the affirmative and 27 in the negative, with 13 being absent, and 1 excused, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Resolve become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted.
2017-08-02HouseThis Resolve, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Resolve become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?"
2017-07-20SenateFINALLY PASSED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
2017-07-20HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-07-20HouseFINALLY PASSED.
2017-07-20HouseThis being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
2017-07-20HouseORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-07-20HouseThe House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-453) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-323) thereto.
2017-07-20SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence
2017-07-20SenatePASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-453) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-323) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE
2017-07-20SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-453) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-323) thereto ADOPTED
2017-07-20SenateOn further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "A" (S-323) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-453) READ and ADOPTED
2017-07-20SenateUnder further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator RECONSIDERED whereby The Senate ADOPTED Committee Amendment "A" (H-453)
2017-07-20SenateOn motion by Same Senator Under suspension of the Rules The Senate RECONSIDERED PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED
2017-07-20SenateOn Motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE.
2017-06-13SenateOn motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE
2017-06-12HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-12HouseFINALLY PASSED.
2017-06-09SenateOrdered sent down forthwith.
2017-06-09SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-453), in concurrence.
2017-06-09SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-453) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
2017-06-09SenateREAD ONCE.
2017-06-09SenateReport READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence.
2017-06-08HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-06-08HouseThe Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-453).
2017-06-08HouseUnder suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY.
2017-06-08HouseCONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY
2017-03-28SenateOn motion by Senator Langley of Hancock, REFERRED to the Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs, in concurrence.
2017-03-23HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-03-23HouseOn motion of Representative MARTIN of Sinclair, the Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS.
2017-03-23HouseCommittee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback