ME LD1140 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-07 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-07 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Preserve the Economic Viability of Maine's Historic Properties
Title
An Act To Preserve the Economic Viability of Maine's Historic Properties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-06 - House - Recede And Concur RC #234 (Y: 71 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [FAIL]
2017-06-01 - House - Acc Min Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #209 (Y: 72 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-06-01 - House - Acc Min Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #209 (Y: 72 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-07 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2017-06-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report AND PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-345) In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-06-06 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-06 | House | Subsequently, The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2017-06-06 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 234 (Yeas 71 - Nays 73 - Absent 6 - Excused 1) |
2017-06-06 | House | to ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-345) FAILED. |
2017-06-06 | House | Motion of Representative ESPLING of New Gloucester to RECEDE and CONCUR |
2017-06-06 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-06 | House | The House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-345) In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-345) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-06-05 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-06-05 | Senate | On motion by Senator VOLK of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-06-05 | Senate | Reports Read |
2017-06-01 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-01 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 209 (Yeas 72 - Nays 70 - Absent 8 - Excused 1) |
2017-06-01 | House | On motion of Representative FECTEAU of Biddeford, the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-06-01 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT in concurrence |
2017-03-23 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-23 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. |
2017-03-23 | House | Committee on Labor, Commerce, Research and Economic Development suggested and ordered printed. |