ME LD1133 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-04 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-04 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Summary
An Act To Implement the Recommendations of the Commission To Study the Protection of Farms and Farmland
Title
An Act To Implement the Recommendations of the Commission To Study the Protection of Farms and Farmland
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-04 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2009-06-04 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-06-04 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2009-06-01 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-06-01 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-274). | |
2009-06-01 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2009-06-01 | (H) Under suspension of the rules | |
2009-06-01 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2009-06-01 | (S) Sent down for concurrence | |
2009-06-01 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-274) | |
2009-06-01 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Damon, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2009-05-29 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2009-05-29 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (S-274) READ and ADOPTED | |
2009-05-29 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2009-05-29 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules Report READ and ACCEPTED | |
2009-03-26 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-03-26 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY | |
2009-03-26 | (H) Report was READ and ACCEPTED. | |
2009-03-25 | (S) Sent down for concurrence | |
2009-03-25 | (S) On motion by Senator NUTTING of Androscoggin REFERRED to the Committee on AGRICULTURE, CONSERVATION AND FORESTRY | |
2009-03-25 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED | |
2009-03-25 | (S) Reported by Senator NUTTING for the Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Forestry pursuant to Public Law 2007, chapter 649, section 11, subsection 6 |