ME LD1130 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Laws Regarding the Determination of Domicile Based on the Geographic Location of an Individual's Bank
Title
An Act To Amend the Laws Regarding the Determination of Domicile Based on the Geographic Location of an Individual's Bank
Sponsors
Sen. Jonathan Courtney [R] | Sen. Dana Dow [R] | Rep. Robert Harmon [R] | Sen. Anne Haskell [D] |
Rep. Gary Knight [R] | Sen. Debra Plowman [R] | Rep. Wesley Richardson [R] | Sen. Amy Volk [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-16 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency -2/3 Elected Required in concurrence | |
2011-05-16 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-05-16 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2011-05-11 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-05-11 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-59) | |
2011-05-11 | (H) READ the Second Time. | |
2011-05-11 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative RICHARDSON of Carmel, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2011-05-10 | (H) TOMORROW ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING. | |
2011-05-10 | (H) Committee Amendment "A" (S-59) was READ and ADOPTED. | |
2011-05-10 | (H) The Bill was READ ONCE. | |
2011-05-10 | (H) On motion of Representative KNIGHT of Livermore Falls, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. | |
2011-05-10 | (H) Reports READ. | |
2011-05-05 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME And PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-59) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2011-05-05 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Rosen, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2011-05-03 | (S) ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY | |
2011-05-03 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (S-59) READ and ADOPTED. | |
2011-05-03 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2011-05-03 | (S) Reports READ On motion by Senator TRAHAN of Lincoln Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-59) Report ACCEPTED. | |
2011-03-17 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-03-17 | (H) Bill REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. | |
2011-03-16 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2011-03-16 | (S) On motion by Senator Hastings of Oxford REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION | |
2011-03-16 | (S) suggested and ordered printed | |
2011-03-16 | (S) Committee on TAXATION |