ME LD113 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Strengthen the Coequal Branches of Maine Government by Ensuring the Legislature Has Access to Necessary Information
Title
An Act To Strengthen the Coequal Branches of Maine Government by Ensuring the Legislature Has Access to Necessary Information
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2021-04-28 | Senate | On motion by Senator BALDACCI of Penobscot the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Reports Read |
2021-03-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-30 | House | On motion of Representative MATLACK of St. George, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-03-30 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-25 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP |
2021-03-17 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-02-10 | Joint | Work Session Held: TABLED |
2021-01-11 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT pursuant to Joint Rule 308.2 and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 401. |
2021-01-11 | House | Received by the Clerk of the House on January 11, 2021. |