ME LD1114 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-15 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Passed on March 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-15 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding Sexual Exploitation of Children
Title
An Act Regarding Sexual Exploitation of Children
Sponsors
Sen. William Diamond [D] | Rep. Ricky Long [R] | Sen. David C. Burns [R] | Sen. Andre Cushing [R] |
Sen. Anne Haskell [D] | Sen. Kimberley Rosen [R] | Sen. Mark Dion [D] | Sen. Stacey Guerin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-15 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2016-03-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-10 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2016-03-09 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-09 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-369). |
2016-03-09 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2016-03-09 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. |
2016-03-08 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-369). |
2016-03-03 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-369) READ and ADOPTED |
2016-03-01 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED |
2015-07-21 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. , in concurrence. |
2015-06-30 | House | Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. in concurrence |
2015-03-31 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-03-31 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | On motion by Senator Rosen of Hancock REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY |
2015-03-26 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY |