ME LD1110 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-29 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-29 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Study Transportation Funding Reform
Title
Resolve, To Study Transportation Funding Reform
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-29 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD). |
2016-04-01 | Senate | On motion by Senator CUSHING of Penobscot PLACED ON THE SPECIAL STUDY TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE - Emergency 2/3 Elected Required in concurrence |
2016-03-31 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-31 | House | FINALLY PASSED. |
2016-03-31 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-563) in concurrence |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-563) READ and ADOPTED |
2016-03-30 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Subsequently, the Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-03-22 | Senate | On motion by Senator COLLINS of York Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE of the OUGHT TO PASS AS AMENDED Report in concurrence |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Report READ |
2016-03-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-03-17 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-563) |
2016-03-17 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2016-03-17 | House | Under suspension of the rules |
2016-03-17 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2015-06-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. , in concurrence. |
2015-06-30 | House | Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. in concurrence |
2015-03-31 | Senate | On motion by Senator Collins of York, REFERRED to the Committee on Transportation, in concurrence. |
2015-03-26 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-03-26 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TRANSPORTATION. |
2015-03-26 | House | Committee on Transportation suggested and ordered printed. |