ME LD1101 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on June 2 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-02 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Passed on June 2 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-02 - (S) Under suspension of the Rules FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
Summary
Resolve, To Understand and Assist in Efforts To Promote Science, Technology, Engineering and Math Education
Title
Resolve, To Understand and Assist in Efforts To Promote Science, Technology, Engineering and Math Education
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-02 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules FINALLY PASSED in concurrence | |
2009-06-02 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-06-02 | (H) FINALLY PASSED. | |
2009-05-28 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-05-28 | (H) The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-208) | |
2009-05-28 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2009-05-28 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2009-05-28 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2009-05-28 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2009-05-28 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-208) | |
2009-05-28 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Damon, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2009-05-27 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2009-05-27 | (S) Committee Amendment "A" (S-208) READ and ADOPTED | |
2009-05-27 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2009-05-27 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED | |
2009-03-25 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-03-25 | (H) Resolve REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. | |
2009-03-25 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2009-03-25 | (S) On motion by Senator Alfond of Cumberland REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS | |
2009-03-25 | (S) Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |