ME LD1100 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Clarify the Contents of the Complete Agency Record in the Appeal of an Agency's Failure or Refusal To Act
Title
An Act To Clarify the Contents of the Complete Agency Record in the Appeal of an Agency's Failure or Refusal To Act
Sponsors
Sen. Everett Carson [D] | Rep. Michael Brennan [D] | Sen. Michael Carpenter [D] | Sen. Paul Davis [R] |
Sen. Mark Lawrence [D] | Rep. Rebecca Millett [D] | Rep. Ralph Tucker [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-04-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-30 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-04-25 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-04-25 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-50). |
2019-04-25 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-04-25 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-50). |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-50) READ and ADOPTED. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2019-03-05 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-05 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Committee on JUDICIARY suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on JUDICIARY Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |