ME LD110 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Placed in the Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Placed in the Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Limit Political Contributions by Public Employee Labor Unions
Title
An Act To Limit Political Contributions by Public Employee Labor Unions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-16 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #96 (Y: 91 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | Senate | Placed in the Legislative Files (DEAD). |
2013-05-20 | Senate | On motion by Senator TUTTLE of York the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2013-05-16 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-05-16 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 96 (Yeas 91 - Nays 53 - Absent 7 - Excused 0) |
2013-05-16 | House | On motion of Representative LUCHINI of Ellsworth, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2013-05-16 | House | Reports READ. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | On motion by Senator TUTTLE of York REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS, in concurrence. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by the President. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | (Unfinished Business) |
2013-01-24 | Senate | On motion by Senator TUTTLE of York TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE, in concurrence. |
2013-01-24 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-01-24 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2013-01-24 | House | Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |