ME LD11 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

RESOLUTION, Proposing an Amendment to the Constitution of Maine To Establish the Right To Hunt and Fish

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RESOLUTION, Proposing an Amendment to the Constitution of Maine To Establish the Right To Hunt and Fish

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - Senate - Pass To Be Engrossed As Amend RC #526 (Y: 21 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #492 (Y: 75 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-20SenatePlaced in Legislative Files (DEAD)
2018-03-20SenateOn motion by Senator CYRWAY of Kennebec The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of Minority OUGHT TO PASS AS AMENDED Report was READ and ACCEPTED and the Bill PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-589) In NON-CONCURRENCE
2018-03-15HouseThe House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-03-06SenateOrdered sent down forthwith for concurrence
2018-03-06SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 526 Yeas 21 - Nays 13 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
2018-03-06SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-589) In NON-CONCURRENCE
2018-03-06SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-589) READ and ADOPTED
2018-03-06SenateREAD ONCE
2018-03-06SenateSubsequently On motion by Senator CYRWAY of Kennebec The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-589) Report ACCEPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE
2018-03-06SenateTaken from the table by the President
2018-03-01SenateUnfinished Business
2018-02-27SenateUnfinished Business
2018-02-22SenateUnfinished Business
2018-02-22SenateOn motion by Senator CYRWAY of Kennebec Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT
2018-02-22SenateReports READ
2018-02-20HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2018-02-20HouseROLL CALL NO. 492 (Yeas 75 - Nays 69 - Absent 7 - Excused 0)
2018-02-20HouseSubsequently, on motion of Representative DUCHESNE of Hudson, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED.
2018-02-20HouseSpeaker laid before the House
2018-02-15HouseUnfinished Business
2018-02-15HouseLater today assigned.
2018-02-15HouseOn motion of Representative ESPLING of New Gloucester, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report.
2018-02-15HouseReports READ.
2017-08-02HouseCarried over to any special or regular session, or both, of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138.
2017-08-02SenateCARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 128th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 1138.
2017-01-26SenateOn motion by Senator CYRWAY of Kennebec The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE in concurrence
2017-01-26SenateTaken from the table by the President
2017-01-19SenateUnfinished Business
2017-01-17SenateUnfinished Business
2017-01-11SenateUnfinished Business
2017-01-10SenateUnfinished Business
2017-01-10SenateOn motion by Senator CYRWAY of Kennebec Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending REFERENCE
2017-01-05HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2017-01-05HouseThe RESOLUTION was REFERRED to the Committee on INLAND FISHERIES AND WILDLIFE.
2017-01-05HouseCommittee on Inland Fisheries and Wildlife suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback