ME LD1097 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-15 - Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 698 Yeas 33 - Nays 0 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 15 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-15 - Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 698 Yeas 33 - Nays 0 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 PREVAILED
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Improve the Integrity of Maine's Welfare Programs
Title
An Act To Improve the Integrity of Maine's Welfare Programs
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-15 - House - Adopt Sas-542 To Cas-481 RC #645 (Y: 106 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - Senate - Enactment RC #698 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-b Rpt RC #621 (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-15 - Senate - Enactment RC #698 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Senate - Accept Min Otp-b Rpt RC #621 (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-15 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 698 Yeas 33 - Nays 0 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 PREVAILED |
2016-04-15 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2016-04-15 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-04-15 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2016-04-15 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-04-15 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-481) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-542) thereto. |
2016-04-15 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2016-04-15 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-481) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-542) thereto ADOPTED. |
2016-04-15 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 645 (Yeas 106 - Nays 38 - Absent 7 - Excused 0) |
2016-04-15 | House | Senate Amendment "A" (S-542) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-481) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2016-04-15 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-481) was READ. |
2016-04-15 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2016-04-15 | House | On motion of Representative GATTINE of Westbrook, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2016-04-15 | House | Reports READ. |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-481) As Amended By Senate Amendment "A" (S-542) thereto |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-481) As Amended By Senate Amendment "A" (S-542) thereto ADOPTED |
2016-04-15 | Senate | On motion by Senator BAKER of Sagadahoc Senate Amendment "A" (S-542) to Committee Amendment "A" (S-481) READ and ADOPTED |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-481) READ |
2016-04-15 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Subsequently, The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-481) Report ACCEPTED |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Acceptance of the Minority Ought to Pass As Amended by Committee Amendment "B" (S-482) FAILED The Senator from Oxford, Sentor Patrick asked and received leave of the Senate to withdraw his request for a Roll Call. A DIVISION WAS ORDERED |
2016-04-15 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-04-11 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2016-04-08 | Senate | On motion by Senator MASON of Androscoggin Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE of the Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Roll Call Requested |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Subsequently, The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2016-04-08 | Senate | On motion by Senator PATRICK of Oxford The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby The Minority OUGHT TO PASS AS AMENDED Report was ACCEPTED |
2016-04-07 | Senate | HELD at the Request of Senator HILL of York. |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "B" (S-482) |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment "B" (S-482) READ and ADOPTED |
2016-04-07 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 621 Yeas 21 - Nays 14 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 PREVAILED |
2016-04-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin The Minority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Reports READ |
2015-06-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. , in concurrence. |
2015-06-30 | House | Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. in concurrence |
2015-03-25 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-03-25 | House | Bill REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | On motion by Senator Brakey of Androscoggin REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2015-03-25 | Senate | suggested and ordered printed |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |