ME LD1082 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Failed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Failed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Ensure Equitable Support of Education for Maine Students in School Administrative District No. 6 and School Administrative District No. 44
Title
An Act To Ensure Equitable Support of Education for Maine Students in School Administrative District No. 6 and School Administrative District No. 44
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-03 - House - Indef Postpone Bill & Papers RC #146 (Y: 83 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - House - Table Until Later RC #142 (Y: 107 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-06-03 - House - Table Until Later RC #142 (Y: 107 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-04 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD). |
2015-06-04 | Senate | On motion by Senator CUSHING of Penobscot Bill and accompanying papers INDEFINITELY POSTPONED , in concurrence. |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President ProTem |
2015-06-04 | Senate | On motion by Senator CUSHING of Penobscot Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE of OUGHT TO PASS AS AMENDED Report |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Report READ |
2015-06-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-03 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 146 (Yeas 83 - Nays 63 - Absent 5 - Excused 0) |
2015-06-03 | House | Subsequently, the Bill and accompanying papers were INDEFINITELY POSTPONED. |
2015-06-03 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2015-06-03 | House | Later today assigned. |
2015-06-03 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 142 (Yeas 107 - Nays 36 - Absent 8 - Excused 0) |
2015-06-03 | House | On motion of Representative ESPLING of New Gloucester, TABLED pending the motion of Representative SHAW of Standish to INDEFINITELY POSTPONE the Bill and accompanying papers. |
2015-06-03 | House | Representative SHAW of Standish MOVED to INDEFINITELY POSTPONE the Bill and accompanying papers. |
2015-06-03 | House | The Committee Report was READ. |
2015-06-03 | House | On OBJECTION of Representative SHAW of Standish REMOVED. |
2015-06-03 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2015-04-01 | Senate | On motion by Senator Langley of Hancock, REFERRED to the Committee on Education and Cultural Affairs, in concurrence. |
2015-03-31 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-03-31 | House | Subsequently, the Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS. |
2015-03-31 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2015-03-26 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-03-25 | House | Unfinished Business |
2015-03-25 | House | Later today assigned. |
2015-03-25 | House | On motion of Representative KORNFIELD of Bangor, TABLED pending REFERENCE. |
2015-03-25 | House | Committee on EDUCATION AND CULTURAL AFFAIRS suggested and ordered printed. |