ME LD1073 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on June 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Placed in the Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Failed on June 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Placed in the Legislative Files (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Establish Minimum Fuel Economy Standards for State Vehicles
Title
An Act To Establish Minimum Fuel Economy Standards for State Vehicles
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-06 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #226 (Y: 74 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-07 | Senate | Placed in the Legislative Files (DEAD). |
2013-06-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator LACHOWICZ of Kennebec the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-07 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2013-06-06 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-06 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 226 (Yeas 74 - Nays 70 - Absent 7 - Excused 0) |
2013-06-06 | House | Subsequently, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2013-06-06 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2013-06-06 | House | Later today assigned. |
2013-06-06 | House | On motion of Representative BERRY of Bowdoinham TABLED pending the motion of Representative GRAHAM of North Yarmouth to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2013-06-06 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2013-06-05 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-06-04 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-06-04 | House | Later today assigned. |
2013-06-04 | House | On further motion of the same Representative TABLED pending her motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2013-06-04 | House | Representative GRAHAM of North Yarmouth moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2013-06-04 | House | Reports READ. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | On motion by Senator Lachowicz of Kennebec, REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT, in concurrence. |
2013-03-20 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-03-20 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2013-03-20 | House | Committee on State and Local Government suggested and ordered printed. |