ME LD1073 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - (S) FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-16 - (S) FINALLY PASSED in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Encourage the Use of Defibrillators in Health Clubs and Gyms
Title
Resolve, To Encourage the Use of Defibrillators in Health Clubs and Gyms
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Bolduc [D] | Rep. Alan Casavant [D] | Rep. Anne Graham [D] | Rep. Megan Rochelo [D] |
Sen. Linda Sanborn [D] | Sen. Nancy Sullivan [D] | Rep. John Tuttle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-16 | (S) FINALLY PASSED in concurrence | |
2011-05-16 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-05-16 | (H) FINALLY PASSED. | |
2011-05-11 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-172) in concurrence | |
2011-05-11 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Rosen, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2011-05-10 | (S) ASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY. | |
2011-05-10 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence READ ONCE Committee Amendment "A" (H-172) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence | |
2011-05-05 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-05-05 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-172) | |
2011-05-05 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2011-05-05 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative RICHARDSON of Carmel, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2011-05-03 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2011-03-15 | (S) On motion by Senator McCormick of Kennebec, REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2011-03-15 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-03-15 | (H) The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. | |
2011-03-15 | (H) Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |