ME LD1069 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Tax Expenditure Review Process
Title
An Act To Amend the Tax Expenditure Review Process
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-14 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2019-05-08 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-05-08 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2019-05-08 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2019-05-08 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2019-03-05 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION in concurrence |
2019-03-05 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-03-05 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. |
2019-03-05 | House | Committee on Taxation suggested and ordered printed. |