ME LD1069 | 2013-2014 | 126th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Failed on July 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-07-09 - Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Provide Flexibility in the State Prevailing Wage and Benefit Rates
Title
An Act To Provide Flexibility in the State Prevailing Wage and Benefit Rates
Sponsors
Rep. Jennifer DeChant [D] | Sen. John Patrick [D] | Sen. Troy Jackson [D] | Rep. Seth Berry [D] |
Rep. James Campbell [R] | Rep. Aaron Frey [D] | Rep. Paul Gilbert [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-07-09 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #434 (Y: 76 N: 51 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [FAIL]
2013-06-27 - Senate - Enactment RC #357 (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - Senate - Enactment RC #355 (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-06 - House - Enactment RC #219 (Y: 86 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-06-03 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #147 (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-31 - House - Adopt Hah-252 To Cah-131 RC #168 (Y: 85 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-05-31 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #167 (Y: 85 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - Senate - Enactment RC #357 (Y: 19 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - Senate - Enactment RC #355 (Y: 28 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-06 - House - Enactment RC #219 (Y: 86 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-06-03 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #147 (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-05-31 - House - Adopt Hah-252 To Cah-131 RC #168 (Y: 85 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-05-31 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #167 (Y: 85 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-09 | House | Placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2013-07-09 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 434V 76 having voted in the affirmative and 51 in the negative, with 24 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill not become a law and the veto was sustained. |
2013-07-09 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2013-06-27 | Senate | 19 Yeas - 16 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Roll Call # 357 |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Subsequently PASSED TO BE ENACTED , in concurrence. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | On motion by Senator KATZ of Kennebec RECONSIDERED ENACTMENT , in concurrence. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | RELEASED. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | HELD at the Request of Senator KATZ of Kennebec. |
2013-06-27 | Senate | 28 Yeas - 7 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Roll Call # 355 |
2013-06-27 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by Senator CAIN of Penobscot. PASSED TO BE ENACTED , in concurrence. |
2013-06-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator CAIN of Penobscot, PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence. |
2013-06-07 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by the President. |
2013-06-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator JACKSON of Aroostook TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence. |
2013-06-06 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-06-06 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 219 (Yeas 86 - Nays 56 - Absent 9 - Excused 0) |
2013-06-06 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-131) AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "A" (H-252) thereto, in concurrence. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-131) AS AMENDED BY House Amendment "A" (H-252) thereto ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | House Amendment "A" (H-252) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-131) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-131) READ. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | PREVAILED |
2013-06-03 | Senate | (19 -Yeas, 15 -Nays, 0 -Excused, 1 -Absent) |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Roll Call Number 147 |
2013-06-03 | Senate | On motion by Senator PATRICK of Oxford, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED , in concurrence. (Roll Call Ordered) |
2013-06-03 | Senate | TAKEN from the Table by the President. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | On further motion by same Senator, TABLED until Later in Today's Session, pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report, in concurrence. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Senator PATRICK of Oxford moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report, in concurrence. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2013-05-31 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-05-31 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-131) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-252) thereto. |
2013-05-31 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2013-05-31 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-131) as Amended by House Amendment "A" (H-252) thereto ADOPTED. |
2013-05-31 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 168 (Yeas 85 - Nays 53 - Absent 13 - Excused 0) |
2013-05-31 | House | On motion of Representative DeCHANT of Bath, House Amendment "A" (H-252) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-131) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2013-05-31 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-131) was READ. |
2013-05-31 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2013-05-31 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 167 (Yeas 85 - Nays 54 - Absent 12 - Excused 0) |
2013-05-31 | House | Subsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2013-05-31 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2013-05-30 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-05-29 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-05-28 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-05-23 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-05-22 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-05-21 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-05-20 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-05-16 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-05-15 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-05-14 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-05-09 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-05-08 | House | Unfinished Business |
2013-05-08 | House | Later today assigned. |
2013-05-08 | House | On further motion of the same Representative TABLED pending his motion to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2013-05-08 | House | Representative McCABE of Skowhegan moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report. |
2013-05-08 | House | Reports READ. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | On motion by Senator Patrick of Oxford, REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT, in concurrence. |
2013-03-20 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2013-03-20 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR, COMMERCE, RESEARCH AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT. |
2013-03-20 | House | Committee on Labor, Commerce, Research and Economic Development suggested and ordered printed. |