ME LD1059 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Vetoed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - LD 1059 In Senate, June 30, 2015, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 21 In Favor and 14 Against , accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill not become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-30 - LD 1059 In Senate, June 30, 2015, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 21 In Favor and 14 Against , accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill not become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating to Marijuana Testing Facilities
Title
An Act Relating to Marijuana Testing Facilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-30 - Senate - Veto Override (2/3) RC #395 (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-06-30 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #407 (Y: 106 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Enactment RC #263 (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-30 - House - Reconsideration - Veto RC #407 (Y: 106 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - Senate - Enactment RC #263 (Y: 25 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-30 | Senate | LD 1059 In Senate, June 30, 2015, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 21 In Favor and 14 Against , accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill not become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED. |
2015-06-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-30 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 407V 106 having voted in the affirmative and 36 in the negative, with 9 being absent, and accordingly it was the vote of the House that the Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor, since two-thirds of the members of the House so voted. |
2015-06-30 | House | This Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to Article IV, Part Third, Section 2 of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the House proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President ProTem PASSED TO BE ENACTED , in concurrence. Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 263 25 Yeas - 10 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent PREVAILED |
2015-06-16 | Senate | On motion by Senator CUSHING of Penobscot Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ENACTMENT , in concurrence. |
2015-06-16 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President ProTem |
2015-06-15 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-12 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2015-06-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator CUSHING of Penobscot Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence. |
2015-06-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-10 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-345) , in concurrence. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-345) READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | READ ONCE. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | On motion by Senator BRAKEY of Androscoggin the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED, in concurrence. |
2015-06-09 | Senate | Reports READ. |
2015-06-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-09 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-345). |
2015-06-09 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2015-06-09 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-345) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2015-06-09 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2015-06-09 | House | On motion of Representative GIDEON of Freeport, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2015-06-09 | House | Reports READ. |
2015-03-25 | Senate | On motion by Senator Brakey of Androscoggin, REFERRED to the Committee on Health and Human Services, in concurrence. |
2015-03-24 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-03-24 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. |
2015-03-24 | House | Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |