ME LD1047 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Failed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Failed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Protect Homeowners from Improper Foreclosure Fees
Title
An Act To Protect Homeowners from Improper Foreclosure Fees
Sponsors
Sen. Shenna Bellows [D] | Sen. Mark Lawrence [D] | Sen. Everett Carson [D] | Rep. Scott Cyrway [R] |
Sen. Roger Katz [R] | Rep. Barbara Cardone [D] | Rep. Garrel Craig [R] | Rep. Aaron Frey [D] |
Rep. Matthew Moonen [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-27 - Senate - Reconsideration - Veto RC #378 (Y: 19 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-06-08 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #272 (Y: 88 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Accept Min Ontp Rpt RC #245 (Y: 8 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-06-08 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #272 (Y: 88 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-06-07 - Senate - Accept Min Ontp Rpt RC #245 (Y: 8 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-27 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2017-06-27 | Senate | LD 1047 In Senate, June 27, 2017, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 19 IN FAVOR and 15 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill not become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED. |
2017-06-12 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2017-06-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-09 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-06-08 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-08 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-198). |
2017-06-08 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2017-06-08 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-198) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2017-06-08 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2017-06-08 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 272 (Yeas 88 - Nays 57 - Absent 5 - Excused 1) |
2017-06-08 | House | On motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-06-08 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-198) |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-198) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-06-07 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Subsequently The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 245 Yeas 8 - Nays 27 - Excused 0 - Absent 0 |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Motion by Senator KEIM of Oxford to ACCEPT the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report. FAILED |
2017-06-07 | Senate | Reports Read |
2017-03-16 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-16 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-03-16 | Senate | REFERENCE to the Committee on JUDICIARY |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Committee on JUDICIARY suggested and ordered printed |