ME LD1044 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Protect the Rights of Certain Incarcerated Individuals
Title
An Act To Protect the Rights of Certain Incarcerated Individuals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-15 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-14 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-553) in concurrence |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-553) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-14 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator DESCHAMBAULT of York The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-06-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-10 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-553). |
2021-06-10 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-10 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-553) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-10 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-10 | House | On motion of Representative WARREN of Hallowell, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-10 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-10 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2021-05-25 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-05-25 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY in concurrence |
2021-03-11 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-11 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2021-03-11 | House | Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed. |