ME LD1041 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Include Certain Mental Health Workers under the 1998 Special Plan for Retirement
Title
An Act To Include Certain Mental Health Workers under the 1998 Special Plan for Retirement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Legislature adjourned Sine Die and was placed in the Legislative Files. (DEAD) |
2021-07-19 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order HP 1302 |
2021-06-07 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-03 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-03 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-03 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-03 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-114). |
2021-06-03 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-03 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (S-114) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-03 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-03 | House | On motion of Representative SYLVESTER of Portland, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-03 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (S-114) |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (S-114) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-02 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-02 | Senate | On motion by Senator HICKMAN of Kennebec The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2021-06-02 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-05-21 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2021-04-14 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-04-14 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-11 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-11 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |