ME LD1039 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Failed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - (S) IN POSSESSION OF THE SENATE WHEN THE SENATE ADJOURNED SINE DIE AND PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Failed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - (S) IN POSSESSION OF THE SENATE WHEN THE SENATE ADJOURNED SINE DIE AND PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Create a Working Group To Make Recommendations To Improve the Efficiency, Accountability and Proper Administration of Municipal General Assistance Programs
Title
Resolve, To Create a Working Group To Make Recommendations To Improve the Efficiency, Accountability and Proper Administration of Municipal General Assistance Programs
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-30 | (S) IN POSSESSION OF THE SENATE WHEN THE SENATE ADJOURNED SINE DIE AND PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD) | |
2011-06-08 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules in concurrence On motion by Senator KATZ of Kennebec PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending FINAL PASSAGE in concurrence | |
2011-06-08 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-06-08 | (H) FINALLY PASSED. | |
2011-06-07 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-540) in concurrence | |
2011-06-07 | (S) Under suspension of the Rules Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence READ ONCE Committee Amendment "A" (H-540) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence | |
2011-06-07 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-06-07 | (H) The Resolve was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-540) | |
2011-06-07 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2011-06-07 | (H) Under suspension of the rules | |
2011-06-07 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2011-03-10 | (S) On motion by Senator McCormick of Kennebec, REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES and ordered printed, in concurrence. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Committee on Health and Human Services suggested and ordered printed. |