ME LD1038 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Failed on May 2 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-02 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act to Reinstate Plurality Voting by Repealing the Ranked-choice Voting Laws
Title
An Act to Reinstate Plurality Voting by Repealing the Ranked-choice Voting Laws
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-02 - Senate - Accept Majority Ought Not To Pass Report RC #114 (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #46 (Y: 80 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-04-27 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #46 (Y: 80 N: 60 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-02 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 114 Yeas 22 - Nays 11 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 PREVAILED |
2023-05-02 | Senate | On motion by Senator HICKMAN of Kennebec the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report ACCEPTED. in concurrence |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Reports Read |
2023-04-27 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-04-27 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 46 (Yeas 80 - Nays 60 - Absent 10 - Excused 0 - Vacant 1) |
2023-04-27 | House | On motion of Representative SUPICA of Bangor, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2023-04-27 | House | Reports READ. |
2023-04-24 | Joint | Reported Out: ONTP/OTP |
2023-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to any special or regular session of the 131st Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 594. |
2023-03-29 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2023-03-29 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2023-03-07 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2023-03-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2023-03-07 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on VETERANS AND LEGAL AFFAIRS. |
2023-03-07 | House | Committee on Veterans and Legal Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |