ME LD1034 | 2021-2022 | 130th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Provide Funding To Support the Permanent Commission on the Status of Racial, Indigenous and Maine Tribal Populations
Title
An Act To Provide Funding To Support the Permanent Commission on the Status of Racial, Indigenous and Maine Tribal Populations
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-06-16 - House - Recede And Concur RC #312 (Y: 83 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #371 (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #157 (Y: 99 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Accept Maj Otp-a Rpt RC #371 (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #157 (Y: 99 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-02 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-07-02 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-07-02 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-07-02 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-07-02 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-410) as Amended by Senate Amendment "B" (S-391) thereto. |
2021-07-02 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2021-07-02 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-410) AS AMENDED BY Senate Amendment "B" (S-391) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2021-07-02 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-410) as Amended by Senate Amendment "B" (S-391) thereto ADOPTED |
2021-07-02 | Senate | On further motion by Same Senator Senate Amendment "B" (S-391) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-410) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-07-02 | Senate | Under further suspension of the Rules On further motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby Senate Amendment "A" (S-298) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-410) was ADOPTED AND INDEFINITELY POSTPONE the same |
2021-07-02 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules On motion by Same Senator The Senate RECONSIDERED whereby the Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-410) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-298) thereto in concurrence |
2021-07-02 | Senate | On Motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland taken from the SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE. |
2021-06-17 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2021-06-17 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-17 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2021-06-16 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-16 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 312 (Yeas 83 - Nays 57 - Absent 11 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-16 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-410) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-298) thereto. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-410) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-298) thereto In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-410) as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-298) thereto ADOPTED |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Senate Amendment "A" (S-298) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-410) READ and ADOPTED |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-410) READ |
2021-06-15 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 371 Yeas 27 - Nays 4 - Excused 4 - Absent 0 |
2021-06-15 | Senate | On motion by Senator BALDACCI of Penobscot The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report ACCEPTED |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Taken from the table by the President |
2021-06-14 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2021-06-08 | Senate | On motion by Senator BALDACCI of Penobscot Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending ACCEPTANCE OF EITHER REPORT |
2021-06-08 | Senate | Reports READ |
2021-06-07 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-06-07 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-410). |
2021-06-07 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2021-06-07 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-410) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2021-06-07 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2021-06-07 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 157 (Yeas 99 - Nays 41 - Absent 11 - Excused 0) |
2021-06-07 | House | On motion of Representative MATLACK of St. George, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2021-06-07 | House | Reports READ. |
2021-06-04 | Joint | Reported Out: OTP-AM/ONTP |
2021-04-21 | Joint | Voted: Divided Report |
2021-04-21 | Joint | Work Session Held |
2021-03-30 | House | Carried over, in the same posture, to a subsequent special or regular session of the 130th Legislature, pursuant to Joint Order SP 435. |
2021-03-30 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-30 | House | The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to REFERENCE to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Sent down for concurrence |
2021-03-30 | Senate | On motion by Same Senator The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2021-03-30 | Senate | On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc the Report was Rejected |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Unfinished Business |
2021-03-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator VITELLI of Sagadahoc Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending CONSIDERATION |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Report READ |
2021-03-10 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2021-03-10 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |
2021-03-10 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2021-03-10 | House | Representative SYLVESTER for the Permanent Commission on the Status of Racial, Indigenous and Maine Tribal Populations pursuant to the Maine Revised Statutes, Title 5, section 25007, subsection 2, paragraph D, reports that the Bill be REFERRED to the Committee on LABOR AND HOUSING and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. |