ME LD1027 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-13 - LD 1027 In Senate, June 13, 2017, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 4 IN FAVOR and 31 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill not become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-13 - LD 1027 In Senate, June 13, 2017, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 4 IN FAVOR and 31 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill not become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Regarding the Taxation of Certain Nonprofit Organizations
Title
An Act Regarding the Taxation of Certain Nonprofit Organizations
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Saviello [R] | Sen. Paul Davis [R] | Sen. Dana Dow [R] | Sen. Roger Katz [R] |
Sen. Russell Black [R] | Rep. Lance Harvell [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-06-13 - Senate - Reconsideration - Veto RC #285 (Y: 4 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-13 | Senate | LD 1027 In Senate, June 13, 2017, this Bill, having been returned by the Governor, together with objections to the same pursuant to the provisions of the Constitution of the State of Maine, after reconsideration, the Senate proceeded to vote on the question: "Shall this Bill become a law notwithstanding the objections of the Governor?" 4 IN FAVOR and 31 AGAINST, accordingly it was the vote of the Senate that the Bill not become law and the VETO was SUSTAINED. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence. |
2017-05-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-25 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2017-05-23 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-23 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2017-05-23 | House | Under suspension of the rules CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2017-05-23 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED. |
2017-05-18 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED. |
2017-03-14 | House | In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-14 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-03-14 | Senate | REFERENCE to the Committee on TAXATION |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Committee on TAXATION suggested and ordered printed |