ME LD1026 | 2009-2010 | 124th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-29 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on April 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-29 - (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
Summary
An Act Concerning Mercury-added Button Cell Batteries
Title
An Act Concerning Mercury-added Button Cell Batteries
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-29 | (S) PASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence | |
2009-04-28 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-04-28 | (H) ROLL CALL NO. 39 (Yeas 141 - Nays 0 - Absent 10 - Excused 0) | |
2009-04-28 | (H) PASSED TO BE ENACTED. | |
2009-04-16 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-04-16 | (H) The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED | |
2009-04-16 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. | |
2009-04-16 | (H) Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative HAYES, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. | |
2009-04-15 | (H) CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY | |
2009-04-14 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2009-04-14 | (S) READ A SECOND TIME PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED | |
2009-04-14 | (S) COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY Senator Damon, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. | |
2009-04-09 | (S) Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day | |
2009-04-09 | (S) READ ONCE | |
2009-04-09 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED | |
2009-03-17 | (H) In concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2009-03-17 | (H) Bill REFERRED to the Committee on NATURAL RESOURCES and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218. | |
2009-03-17 | (H) Report was READ and ACCEPTED. | |
2009-03-17 | (S) Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2009-03-17 | (S) On motion by Senator Goodall of Sagadahoc REFERRED to the Committee on NATURAL RESOURCES and ordered printed pursuant to Joint Rule 218 | |
2009-03-17 | (S) Report READ and ACCEPTED. | |
2009-03-17 | (S) Reported by Senator GOODALL of Sagadahoc for the Department of Environmental Protection pursuant to Public Law 2005, chapter 509, section 3. |