ME LD1025 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 91-4-1)
Status: Passed on May 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-21 - Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 112 Yeas 25 - Nays 9 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Prohibit the Provision of Conversion Therapy to Minors by Certain Licensed Professionals

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Prohibit the Provision of Conversion Therapy to Minors by Certain Licensed Professionals

Sponsors

Rep. Ryan Fecteau [D]Rep. Robert Alley [D]Rep. Betty Austin [D]Rep. Christopher Babbidge [D]
Rep. Shawn Babine [D]Rep. Donna Bailey [D]Rep. Pinny Beebe-Center [D]Sen. Shenna Bellows [D]
Rep. Seth Berry [D]Rep. Lydia Blume [D]Sen. Catherine Breen [D]Rep. Michael Brennan [D]
Rep. Heidi Brooks [D]Rep. Mark Bryant [D]Rep. Christopher Caiazzo [D]Rep. Barbara Cardone [D]
Rep. Anne Carney [D]Sen. Justin Chenette [D]Sen. Benjamin Chipman [D]Sen. Ned Claxton [D]
Rep. Kristen Cloutier [D]Rep. Benjamin Collings [D]Rep. Janice Cooper [D]Rep. Margaret Craven [D]
Rep. Edward Crockett [D]Rep. Scott Cuddy [D]Rep. Matthea Larsen Daughtry [D]Rep. Diane Denk [D]
Rep. Dale Denno [D]Sen. Susan Deschambault [D]Sen. James Dill [D]Rep. Janice Dodge [D]
Rep. Donna Doore [D]Rep. Victoria Doudera [D]Rep. Michelle Dunphy [D]Rep. Jeffrey Evangelos [I]
Rep. Richard Farnsworth [D]Rep. Victoria Foley [D]Rep. Andrew Gattine [D]Rep. Sara Gideon [D]
Rep. Lori Gramlich [D]Sen. Geoffrey Gratwick [D]Rep. Nicole Grohoski [D]Rep. Thomas Harnett [D]
Rep. Allison Hepler [D]Rep. Craig Hickman [D]Rep. Daniel Hobbs [D]Rep. Brian Hubbell [D]
Rep. Patricia Hymanson [D]Rep. Henry Ingwersen [D]Rep. Erik Jorgensen [D]Rep. Christopher Kessler [D]
Rep. Victoria Kornfield [D]Sen. Mark Lawrence [D]Sen. Nathan Libby [D]Sen. Louis Luchini [D]
Rep. Colleen Madigan [D]Rep. Anne-Marie Mastraccio [D]Rep. Ann Matlack [D]Rep. Chloe Maxmin [D]
Rep. Joyce McCreight [D]Rep. Genevieve McDonald [D]Rep. Andrew McLean [D]Rep. Gina Melaragno [D]
Rep. Michele Meyer [D]Sen. Rebecca Millett [D]Sen. David Miramant [D]Rep. Matthew Moonen [D]
Sen. Marianne Moore [R]Rep. Victoria Morales [D]Rep. Catherine Nadeau [D]Rep. Margaret O'Neil [D]
Rep. Sarah Pebworth [D]Rep. Ann Peoples [D]Rep. Anne Perry [D]Rep. Teresa Pierce [D]
Rep. Lois Galgay Reckitt [D]Rep. Tiffany Roberts-Lovell [D]Sen. Kimberley Rosen [R]Rep. Deane Rykerson [D]
Sen. Heather Sanborn [D]Sen. Linda Sanborn [D]Rep. John Schneck [D]Rep. Braden Sharpe [D]
Rep. Holly Stover [D]Rep. Scott Strom [R]Rep. Michael Sylvester [D]Rep. Rachel Talbot Ross [D]
Rep. Denise Tepler [D]Rep. Maureen Terry [D]Rep. Ryan Tipping-Spitz [D]Rep. Ralph Tucker [D]
Sen. Eloise Vitelli [D]Rep. Charlotte Warren [D]Sen. David Woodsome [R]Rep. Stanley Zeigler [D]

Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Senate - Enactment RC #112 (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Suspend Rules (2/3) RC #111 (Y: 12 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Table Until Later RC #110 (Y: 11 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-05-08 - House - Indef Pp Hah-222 RC #81 (Y: 91 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #80 (Y: 91 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-05-08 - House - Indef Postpone Bill & Papers RC #79 (Y: 49 N: 89 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2019-05-08 - House - Adjourment RC #78 (Y: 52 N: 87 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]
2019-05-08 - House - Table Until Later RC #77 (Y: 50 N: 89 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-21SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 112 Yeas 25 - Nays 9 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
2019-05-21SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED in concurrence
2019-05-21SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 111 Yeas 12 - Nays 22 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
2019-05-21SenateMotion by Senator GUERIN of Penobscot Suspend the Rules for Reconsideration FAILED
2019-05-21SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 110 Yeas 11 - Nays 23 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
2019-05-21SenateSenator TIMBERLAKE of Androscoggin moved to Table FAILED
2019-05-21SenateOn motion by Senator GUERIN of Penobscot Suspend the Rules for Reconsideration
2019-05-21SenateTaken from the table by the President
2019-05-16SenateOn motion by Senator GUERIN of Penobscot Tabled until Later in Today's Session, pending PASSAGE TO BE ENACTED, in concurrence.
2019-05-14HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-14HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-05-09SenateUnder suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-213) in concurrence
2019-05-09SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (H-213) READ and ADOPTED
2019-05-09SenateREAD ONCE
2019-05-09SenateOn motion by Senator SANBORN, H. of Cumberland the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED.
2019-05-09SenateReports Read
2019-05-09HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-05-09HouseRELEASED.
2019-05-08HouseHELD at the Request of Representative FECTEAU of Biddeford.
2019-05-08HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-213).
2019-05-08HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2019-05-08HouseSubsequently, Committee Amendment "A" (H-213) was ADOPTED.
2019-05-08HouseROLL CALL NO. 81 (Yeas 91 - Nays 45 - Absent 13 - Excused 1 Vacant 1)
2019-05-08HouseOn motion of Representative MOONEN of Portland House Amendment "A" (H-222) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-213) was INDEFINITELY POSTPONED.
2019-05-08HouseOn motion of Representative FAULKINGHAM of Winter Harbor, House Amendment "A" (H-222) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-213) was READ.
2019-05-08HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (H-213) was READ.
2019-05-08HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2019-05-08HouseROLL CALL NO. 80 (Yeas 91 - Nays 46 - Absent 12 - Excused 1 Vacant 1)
2019-05-08HouseSubsequently, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2019-05-08HouseROLL CALL NO. 79 (Yeas 49 - Nays 89 - Absent 11 - Excused 1 Vacant 1)
2019-05-08HouseMotion of Representative KINNEY of Knox to INDEFINITELY POSTPONE the Bill and accompanying papers FAILED.
2019-05-08HouseROLL CALL NO. 77 (Yeas 50 - Nays 89 - Absent 10 - Excused 1 Vacant 1)
2019-05-08HouseMotion of Representative DILLINGHAM of Oxford, to TABLE pending the motion of Representative TEPLER of Topsham to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report FAILED.
2019-05-08HouseRepresentative TEPLER of Topsham moved to ACCEPT the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report.
2019-05-08HouseReports READ.
2019-03-05SenateThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES in concurrence
2019-02-28HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-02-28HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES.
2019-02-28HouseCommittee on Health Coverage, Insurance and Financial Services suggested and ordered printed.

Subjects


Maine State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1025&snum=129
Texthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0755&item=1&snum=129
Texthttp://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0755&item=2&snum=129
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280072128&chamber=House&serialnumber=77
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280072128&chamber=House&serialnumber=78
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280072128&chamber=House&serialnumber=79
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280072128&chamber=House&serialnumber=80
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280072128&chamber=House&serialnumber=81
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280072128&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=110
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280072128&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=111
Roll Callhttp://legislature.maine.gov/LawMakerWeb/rollcall.asp?ID=280072128&chamber=Senate&serialnumber=112

Bill Comments

feedback