ME LD1021 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-23 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-23 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Amend the Laws Pertaining to the Maine Public Employees Retirement System
Title
An Act To Amend the Laws Pertaining to the Maine Public Employees Retirement System
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-23 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2016-02-18 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-02-18 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-511), in concurrence. |
2016-02-16 | Senate | COMMITTEE ON BILLS IN THE SECOND READING REPORTS NO FURTHER VERBAL AMENDMENTS NECESSARY, Senator Saviello, Senate Chair. REPORT ACCEPTED. |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Assigned for Second Reading next Legislative Day |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-511) READ and ADOPTED in concurrence |
2016-02-11 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2016-02-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2016-02-09 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-511). |
2016-02-09 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - SECOND DAY. |
2016-02-09 | House | Committee on Bills in the Second Reading Reports no further verbal amendments necessary Representative McLEAN of Gorham, Chair, House of Representatives Report Accepted. |
2016-02-04 | House | CONSENT CALENDAR - FIRST DAY |
2015-07-21 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. , in concurrence. |
2015-06-30 | House | Carried over to any special and/or regular session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order HP 992. in concurrence |
2015-03-24 | Senate | On motion by Senator Hamper of Oxford, REFERRED to the Committee on Appropriations and Financial Affairs, in concurrence. |
2015-03-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-03-19 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS. |
2015-03-19 | House | Committee on Appropriations and Financial Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |