ME LD1014 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Failed on June 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-20 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Failed on June 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-20 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Require A Person To Notify Law Enforcement Officers of the Possession of a Hypodermic Needle
Title
An Act To Require A Person To Notify Law Enforcement Officers of the Possession of a Hypodermic Needle
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-20 - House - Insist RC #355 (Y: 75 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - Recede And Concur RC #354 (Y: 73 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-06-19 - House - Acc Min Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #345 (Y: 75 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-06-20 - House - Recede And Concur RC #354 (Y: 73 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2017-06-19 - House - Acc Min Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #345 (Y: 75 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-20 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2017-06-20 | Senate | On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock The Senate INSISTED To ACCEPTANCE of The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report AND PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (H-147) In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-06-20 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-20 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 355 (Yeas 75 - Nays 73 - Absent 3 - Excused 0) |
2017-06-20 | House | Subsequently, the House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report. |
2017-06-20 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 354 (Yeas 73 - Nays 75 - Absent 3 - Excused 0) |
2017-06-20 | House | Motion of Representative ESPLING of New Gloucester to RECEDE and CONCUR FAILED. |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-147) In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-147) READ and ADOPTED |
2017-06-19 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2017-06-19 | Senate | On motion by Senator ROSEN of Hancock the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report ACCEPTED. In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Reports Read |
2017-06-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-06-19 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 345 (Yeas 75 - Nays 73 - Absent 3 - Excused 0) |
2017-06-19 | House | Subsequently, on motion of Representative WARREN of Hallowell, the Minority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-06-19 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2017-06-16 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-15 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-14 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-13 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-12 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-09 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-08 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-07 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-06 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-05 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-06-01 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-31 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-30 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-25 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-24 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-23 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-18 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-17 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-16 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-16 | House | Later today assigned. |
2017-05-16 | House | On motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, TABLED pending ACCEPTANCE of Either Report. |
2017-05-16 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY in concurrence |
2017-03-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-14 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on CRIMINAL JUSTICE AND PUBLIC SAFETY. |
2017-03-14 | House | Committee on Criminal Justice and Public Safety suggested and ordered printed. |