ME LD1004 | 2015-2016 | 127th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-29 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 29 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-29 - In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act To Provide Incentives To Foster Economic Growth and Build Infrastructure in the State by Encouraging Visual Media Production
Title
An Act To Provide Incentives To Foster Economic Growth and Build Infrastructure in the State by Encouraging Visual Media Production
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-11 - Senate - Insist RC #194 (Y: 17 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2015-06-10 - Senate - Accept Maj Ontp Rpt RC #181 (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #191 (Y: 42 N: 106 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2015-06-10 - Senate - Accept Maj Ontp Rpt RC #181 (Y: 18 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-09 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #191 (Y: 42 N: 106 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-29 | Senate | In possession of the Senate when the Senate ADJOURNED SINE DIE and PLACED IN THE LEGISLATIVE FILES (DEAD). |
2015-07-16 | House | Carried over from the Special Appropriations Table to any special or regular session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 555. |
2015-06-30 | Senate | CARRIED OVER to any Special or Regular Session of the 127th Legislature pursuant to Joint Order SP 555. |
2015-06-15 | Senate | On motion by Senator HAMPER of Oxford, PLACED ON THE SPECIAL APPROPRIATIONS TABLE, pending ENACTMENT, in concurrence. |
2015-06-12 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-12 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | On motion by Senator MIRAMANT of Knox The Senate RECEDED and CONCURRED To acceptance of The Minority ought to pass as amended report and passage to be engrossed as amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-326) , in concurrence. |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Roll Call # 194 17 Yeas - 18 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent |
2015-06-11 | Senate | Senator McCORMICK of Kennebec moved The Senate insist to ACCEPTANCE of the Minority Ought Not To Pass Report FAILED |
2015-06-10 | House | ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-10 | House | Subsequently, the House INSISTED on ACCEPTANCE of the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report and PASSAGE TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-326). |
2015-06-10 | House | Subsequently, the same Representative WITHDREW her motion TABLE until later in today's session. |
2015-06-10 | House | Representative ESPLING of New Gloucester MOVED to TABLE until later in today's session. |
2015-06-10 | House | Representative McCABE of Skowhegan MOVED to INSIST. |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence. |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call # 181 18 Yeas - 17 Nays- 0 Excused - 0 Absent PREVAILED |
2015-06-10 | Senate | On motion by Senator McCORMICK of Kennebec Majority Ought Not To Pass Report Accepted , in NON-CONCURRENCE. |
2015-06-10 | Senate | Reports READ |
2015-06-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-06-09 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-326). |
2015-06-09 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2015-06-09 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-326) was READ and ADOPTED. |
2015-06-09 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2015-06-09 | House | Subsequently, the Minority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED. |
2015-06-09 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 191 (Yeas 42 - Nays 106 - Absent 3 - Excused 0) |
2015-06-09 | House | Motion of Representative GOODE of Bangor to ACCEPT the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report FAILED. |
2015-06-09 | House | Reports READ. |
2015-03-24 | Senate | On motion by Senator McCormick of Kennebec, REFERRED to the Committee on Taxation, in concurrence. |
2015-03-19 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2015-03-19 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on TAXATION. |
2015-03-19 | House | Committee on Taxation suggested and ordered printed. |