ME LD1003 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Failed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolve, To Require the State's Mitigation Plan under the Volkswagen Mitigation Trust Agreement To Include the Use of Maine-generated Nonfossil Fuel Sources
Title
Resolve, To Require the State's Mitigation Plan under the Volkswagen Mitigation Trust Agreement To Include the Use of Maine-generated Nonfossil Fuel Sources
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 310.3 Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2017-05-02 | Senate | REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES in concurrence |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Report READ and ACCEPTED in concurrence |
2017-04-27 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-04-27 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES |
2017-04-27 | House | Report was READ and ACCEPTED. |
2017-04-27 | House | Representative MOONEN from the Committee on JUDICIARY Reporting that the Resolve be REFERRED to the Committee on ENVIRONMENT AND NATURAL RESOURCES. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY in concurrence |
2017-03-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-03-14 | House | The Resolve was REFERRED to the Committee on JUDICIARY. |
2017-03-14 | House | Committee on Judiciary suggested and ordered printed. |
Subjects
Maine State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/display_ps.asp?LD=1003&snum=128 |
Text | https://legislature.maine.gov/legis/bills/getPDF.asp?paper=HP0704&item=1&snum=128 |