ME LD1001 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Roll Call Number 309 Yeas 25 - Nays 9 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Roll Call Number 309 Yeas 25 - Nays 9 - Excused 1 - Absent 0
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Making Unified Appropriations and Allocations for the Expenditures of State Government, General Fund and Other Funds, and Changing Certain Provisions of the Law Necessary to the Proper Operations of State Government for the Fiscal Years Ending June 30, 2019, June 30, 2020 and June 30, 2021
Title
An Act Making Unified Appropriations and Allocations for the Expenditures of State Government, General Fund and Other Funds, and Changing Certain Provisions of the Law Necessary to the Proper Operations of State Government for the Fiscal Years Ending June 30, 2019, June 30, 2020 and June 30, 2021
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-14 - Senate - Enact-emer 2/3 Elect RC #309 (Y: 25 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - House - Enactment - Emer RC #271 (Y: 104 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Accept Rpt 'a' Otp-a RC #301 (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - House - Indef Pp Hah-595 To Cah-586 RC #265 (Y: 89 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - House - Acc Report 'a' Otp As Amend RC #264 (Y: 89 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - House - Enactment - Emer RC #271 (Y: 104 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - Senate - Accept Rpt 'a' Otp-a RC #301 (Y: 22 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - House - Indef Pp Hah-595 To Cah-586 RC #265 (Y: 89 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-06-14 - House - Acc Report 'a' Otp As Amend RC #264 (Y: 89 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Senate | Roll Call Number 309 Yeas 25 - Nays 9 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2019-06-14 | Senate | PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence. |
2019-06-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-14 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 271 (Yeas 104 - Nays 38 - Absent 8 - Excused 1) |
2019-06-14 | House | PASSED TO BE ENACTED. |
2019-06-14 | House | This being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary. |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Under suspension of the Rules, READ A SECOND TIME and PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED by Committee Amendment "A" (H-586) in concurrence |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment "A" (H-586) READ and ADOPTED |
2019-06-14 | Senate | READ ONCE |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 301 Yeas 22 - Nays 12 - Excused 1 - Absent 0 |
2019-06-14 | Senate | On motion by Senator BREEN of Cumberland The Report A Ought to Pass As Amended By Committee Amendment "A" (H-586) Report ACCEPTED |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Reports READ |
2019-06-14 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-06-14 | House | The Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (H-586). |
2019-06-14 | House | Under suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading. |
2019-06-14 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-586) was ADOPTED. |
2019-06-14 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 265 (Yeas 89 - Nays 53 - Absent 8 - Excused 1) |
2019-06-14 | House | On motion of Representative GATTINE of Westbrook, House Amendment "A" (H-595) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-586) was INDEFINITELY POSTPONED. |
2019-06-14 | House | On motion of Representative ORDWAY of Standish, House Amendment "A" (H-595) to Committee Amendment "A" (H-586) was READ. |
2019-06-14 | House | Committee Amendment "A" (H-586) was READ. |
2019-06-14 | House | The Bill was READ ONCE. |
2019-06-14 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 264 (Yeas 89 - Nays 52 - Absent 9 - Excused 1) |
2019-06-14 | House | On motion of Representative GATTINE of Westbrook, REPORT A Ought to Pass as Amended was ACCEPTED. |
2019-06-14 | House | Reports READ. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS in concurrence |
2019-02-26 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2019-02-26 | House | The Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on APPROPRIATIONS AND FINANCIAL AFFAIRS. |
2019-02-26 | House | Committee on Appropriations and Financial Affairs suggested and ordered printed. |