ME LD1 | 2019-2020 | 129th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-12 - PASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

An Act To Protect Health Care Coverage for Maine Families

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An Act To Protect Health Care Coverage for Maine Families

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - House - Acc Maj Otp As Amended Rep RC #5 (Y: 140 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Accept Otp-a Rpt RC #19 (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-12SenatePASSED TO BE ENACTED - Emergency - 2/3 Elected Required, in concurrence.
2019-03-07HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-03-07HousePASSED TO BE ENACTED.
2019-03-07HouseThis being an emergency measure, a two-thirds vote of all the members elected to the House was necessary.
2019-03-07HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-03-07HouseThe Bill was PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED as Amended by Committee Amendment "A" (S-3).
2019-03-07HouseUnder suspension of the rules, the Bill was given its SECOND READING without REFERENCE to the Committee on Bills in the Second Reading.
2019-03-07HouseCommittee Amendment "A" (S-3) was READ and ADOPTED.
2019-03-07HouseThe Bill was READ ONCE.
2019-03-07HouseROLL CALL NO. 5 (Yeas 140 - Nays 3 - Absent 5 - Excused 1 Vacant 2)
2019-03-07HouseOn motion of Representative TEPLER of Topsham, the Majority Ought to Pass as Amended Report was ACCEPTED.
2019-03-07HouseReports READ.
2019-03-05SenateSent down for concurrence
2019-03-05SenateREAD A SECOND TIME And PASSED TO BE ENGROSSED AS AMENDED BY Committee Amendment "A" (S-3)
2019-02-28SenateASSIGNED FOR SECOND READING NEXT LEGISLATIVE DAY.
2019-02-28SenateCommittee Amendment "A" (S-3) READ and ADOPTED
2019-02-28SenateREAD ONCE
2019-02-28SenateRoll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 19 Yeas 31 - Nays 0 - Excused 4 - Absent 0
2019-02-28SenateOn motion by Senator SANBORN, H. of Cumberland The Majority Ought to Pass As Amended Report Accepted
2019-02-28SenateReports READ
2019-01-02HouseIn concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2019-01-02HouseThe Bill was REFERRED to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES.
2019-01-02SenateCommittee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES suggested and ordered printed REFERENCE to the Committee on HEALTH COVERAGE, INSURANCE AND FINANCIAL SERVICES Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback