ME HP1251 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum:
Status: Failed on March 22 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-22 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
JOINT RESOLUTION MAKING APPLICATION TO THE CONGRESS OF THE UNITED STATES CALLING A CONSTITUTIONAL CONVENTION UNDER ARTICLE V OF THE UNITED STATES CONSTITUTION LIMITED TO PROPOSING AN AMENDMENT TO THE UNITED STATES CONSTITUTION TO REQUIRE A BALANCED FEDERAL BUDGET
Title
JOINT RESOLUTION MAKING APPLICATION TO THE CONGRESS OF THE UNITED STATES CALLING A CONSTITUTIONAL CONVENTION UNDER ARTICLE V OF THE UNITED STATES CONSTITUTION LIMITED TO PROPOSING AN AMENDMENT TO THE UNITED STATES CONSTITUTION TO REQUIRE A BALANCED FEDERAL BUDGET
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-22 - Senate - Accept Min Otp Rpt RC #547 (Y: 17 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #524 (Y: 87 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-20 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #524 (Y: 87 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-22 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Subsequently 2/3 Vote Required ADOPTION FAILS |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Roll Call Ordered Roll Call Number 547 Yeas 17 - Nays 16 - Excused 2 - Absent 0 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | On motion by Senator DAVIS of Piscataquis The Minority Ought to Pass Report ACCEPTED In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Reports READ |
2018-03-20 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-03-20 | House | On motion of Representative MARTIN of Sinclair, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2018-03-20 | House | Reports READ. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | READ and REFERRED to the Committee on State and Local Government, in concurrence. |
2018-01-25 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2018-01-25 | House | On motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, the Joint Resolution was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2018-01-25 | House | READ. |