ME HP0995 | 2011-2012 | 125th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Enrolled on April 13 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - (H) ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 13 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - (H) ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
JOINT RESOLUTION MEMORIALIZING THE UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE TO EXPEDITE THE INCIDENTAL TAKE PERMIT FOR COYOTES
Title
JOINT RESOLUTION MEMORIALIZING THE UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF THE INTERIOR, UNITED STATES FISH AND WILDLIFE SERVICE TO EXPEDITE THE INCIDENTAL TAKE PERMIT FOR COYOTES
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | (H) ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-04-14 | (H) The House RECEDED and CONCURRED to ADOPTION as Amended by Senate Amendment "A" (S-34). | |
2011-04-13 | (S) Taken from the table by the President On motion by Senator MARTIN of Kennebec Senate Amendment "A" (S-34) READ and ADOPTED Subsequently Joint Resolution ADOPTED As Amended By Senate Amendment "A" (S-34) In NON-CONCURRENCE Ordered sent down forthwith for concurrence | |
2011-03-30 | (S) READ On motion by Senator TRAHAN of Lincoln Tabled Later Today Assigned pending ADOPTION in concurrence | |
2011-03-29 | (H) Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. | |
2011-03-29 | (H) READ and ADOPTED. |