ME HP0987 | 2017-2018 | 128th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
JOINT RESOLUTION MAKING APPLICATION TO THE CONGRESS OF THE UNITED STATES FOR CALLING A CONVENTION TO PROPOSE AMENDMENTS TO THE CONSTITUTION OF THE UNITED STATES TO LIMIT THE POWER OF THE FEDERAL GOVERNMENT
Title
JOINT RESOLUTION MAKING APPLICATION TO THE CONGRESS OF THE UNITED STATES FOR CALLING A CONVENTION TO PROPOSE AMENDMENTS TO THE CONSTITUTION OF THE UNITED STATES TO LIMIT THE POWER OF THE FEDERAL GOVERNMENT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-30 - House - Acc Maj Ought Not To Pass Rep RC #178 (Y: 86 N: 56 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-31 | Senate | Placed in Legislative Files (DEAD) |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Pursuant to Joint Rule 215, FAILED ADOPTION . |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Motion by Senator DAVIS of Piscataquis to ACCEPT the Minority Ought to Pass Report ACCEPTED. In NON-CONCURRENCE |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Reports Read |
2017-05-30 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-30 | House | ROLL CALL NO. 178 (Yeas 86 - Nays 56 - Absent 8 - Excused 1) |
2017-05-30 | House | On motion of Representative MARTIN of Sinclair, the Majority Ought Not to Pass Report was ACCEPTED. |
2017-05-30 | House | Reports READ. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | READ and REFERRED to the Committee on State and Local Government, in concurrence. |
2017-05-09 | House | Sent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH. |
2017-05-09 | House | Subsequently, On motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, the Joint Resolution was REFERRED to the Committee on STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT. |
2017-05-09 | House | Speaker laid before the House |
2017-05-04 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-05-02 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-04-27 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-04-25 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-04-20 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-04-19 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-04-18 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-04-13 | House | Unfinished Business |
2017-04-13 | House | Later today assigned. (2/3 vote required) |
2017-04-13 | House | On motion of Representative HERBIG of Belfast, TABLED pending ADOPTION. |
2017-04-13 | House | READ. |