ME HP0717 | 2023-2024 | 131st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-21 - READ and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

JOINT RESOLUTION DESIGNATING MARCH 12, 2023 TO MARCH 18, 2023 AS AMERICORPS WEEK IN MAINE

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

JOINT RESOLUTION DESIGNATING MARCH 12, 2023 TO MARCH 18, 2023 AS AMERICORPS WEEK IN MAINE

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-21SenateREAD and ADOPTED, in concurrence.
2023-03-16HouseSent for concurrence. ORDERED SENT FORTHWITH.
2023-03-16HouseREAD and ADOPTED.

Subjects


Maine State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback