MD SJ5 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-16 - Assigned a resolution number - Joint Resolution 5
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-16 - Assigned a resolution number - Joint Resolution 5
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the salaries to be paid the Governor and Lieutenant Governor, as directed by Article II, Section 21A of the Maryland Constitution, for the 4-year term of office beginning January 18, 2023.
Title
Governor's Salary Commission - Salary Recommendations for Governor and Lieutenant Governor
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | Senate | Assigned a resolution number - Joint Resolution 5 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Enacted under Article II, Section 21A(d) of the Maryland Constitution |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-24 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HJ4 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-11 - Assigned a resolution number - Joint Resolution 4
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Constitutional Amendments
Governor
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Budgets
Constitutional Amendments
Governor
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials