MD SJ5 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 16 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-15 - Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 16 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-15 - Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 1
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Directing the Attorney General to take specified actions regarding civil and criminal suits and actions that are based on the federal government's action or inaction that threatens the public interest and welfare of the residents of the State; requiring the Attorney General, except under specified circumstances, to provide the Governor with specified notice and an opportunity to review and comment on specified suits and actions before commencing specified suits and actions; etc.
Title
Attorney General - Powers - Maryland Defense Act of 2017
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (89-50) (Y: 89 N: 50 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (29-17) (Y: 29 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion Special Order Until 2/10 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (18-28) (Y: 18 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-02-10 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (29-17) (Y: 29 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Floor - Motion Special Order Until 2/10 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (18-28) (Y: 18 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-15 | Senate | Signed by the President and the Speaker - Joint Resolution 1 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Returned Passed |
2017-02-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (89-50) |
2017-02-15 | House | Motion vote previous question (Delegate McMillan) Adopted |
2017-02-14 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-02-13 | House | Special Order until 2/14 (Delegate Healey) Adopted |
2017-02-13 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-02-13 | House | Favorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2017-02-10 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (29-17) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Motion Special Order until 2/10 (Senator Jennings) Rejected (18-28) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Favorable |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Special Order until later today (Senator Miller) Adopted |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Favorable |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Subjects
Attorney General
Civil Actions
Crimes and Punishments
Federal Government
Governor
Notices
Safety
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Threats
Civil Actions
Crimes and Punishments
Federal Government
Governor
Notices
Safety
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Threats