MD SJ4 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-13 - Assigned a resolution number - Joint Resolution 3
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-13 - Assigned a resolution number - Joint Resolution 3
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the compensation of the members of the Maryland Court of Appeals, the Maryland Court of Special Appeals, the circuit courts, and the District Court of Maryland.
Title
Judicial Compensation Commission - Recommendations
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-13 | Senate | Assigned a resolution number - Joint Resolution 3 |
2022-03-13 | Senate | Enacted under Section 1-708 of the Courts Article |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-21 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
Same As/Similar To
HJ3 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-11 - Assigned a resolution number - Joint Resolution 2
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
General Assembly
Judges
Salaries and Compensation
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
General Assembly
Judges
Salaries and Compensation