MD SJ4 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-30 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-30 - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Pending: House Rules and Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requesting that the President of the United States declare March 10, 2013, as National Harriet Tubman Day.
Title
National Harriet Tubman Day
Sponsors
Sen. Joanne Benson [D] | Sen. Joan Conway [D] | Sen. Verna Jones-Rodwell [D] | Sen. Roger Manno [D] |
Sen. Nathaniel McFadden [D] | Sen. Karen Montgomery [D] | Sen. Catherine Pugh [D] | Sen. Jamin Raskin [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-30 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2012-03-28 | Third Reading Passed (43-0) | |
2012-03-27 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-27 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-04-02 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2012-03-12 | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-12 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-02-29 | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-03 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs |