MD SJ3 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 14 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-22 - - Joint Resolution 5
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 14 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-05-22 - - Joint Resolution 5
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the compensation of the members of the Maryland Court of Appeals, Maryland Court of Special Appeals, the circuit courts, and the District Court of Maryland.
Title
Judicial Compensation Commission - Recommendations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 84 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 84 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - Floor Amendment (ODonnell) Rejected (Y: 49 N: 83 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2012-03-13 - House - Floor Amendment (ODonnell) Rejected (Y: 49 N: 83 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2012-03-12 - House - Floor Amendment (ODonnell) Rejected (Y: 57 N: 67 NV: 7 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Kittleman) {873626/1 Rejected (Y: 9 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2012-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 84 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2012-03-13 - House - Floor Amendment (ODonnell) Rejected (Y: 49 N: 83 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2012-03-13 - House - Floor Amendment (ODonnell) Rejected (Y: 49 N: 83 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2012-03-12 - House - Floor Amendment (ODonnell) Rejected (Y: 57 N: 67 NV: 7 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 33 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-05 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Kittleman) {873626/1 Rejected (Y: 9 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | - Joint Resolution 5 | |
2012-05-22 | Signed by the President and the Speaker | |
2012-03-13 | Third Reading Passed (84-47) | |
2012-03-13 | Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) Rejected (49-83) | |
2012-03-13 | Motion vote previous question (Delegate Minnick) Adopted | |
2012-03-13 | Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) 353929/2 | |
2012-03-12 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-12 | Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) Rejected (57-67) | |
2012-03-12 | Motion vote previous question (Delegate Barnes) Adopted | |
2012-03-12 | Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) | |
2012-03-12 | Motion vote previous question (Delegate Minnick) Rejected | |
2012-03-12 | Floor Amendment (Delegate O'Donnell) 353929/1 | |
2012-03-12 | Special Order until later today (Delegate O'Donnell) Adopted | |
2012-03-12 | Favorable Adopted | |
2012-03-12 | Favorable Report by Appropriations | |
2012-03-08 | First Reading Appropriations | |
2012-03-14 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-07 | Third Reading Passed (33-9) | |
2012-03-05 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2012-03-05 | Floor Amendment (Senator Kittleman) 873626/1 Rejected (9-33) | |
2012-03-05 | Favorable with Amendments 189430/1 Report Adopted | |
2012-03-05 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2012-01-30 | Hearing 2/8 at 1:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) | |
2012-01-27 | First Reading Budget and Taxation & Judicial Proceedings |
Subjects
Circuit Courts
Committees and Commissions
Court of Appeals
Court of Special Appeals
District Courts
Judges
Salaries
Committees and Commissions
Court of Appeals
Court of Special Appeals
District Courts
Judges
Salaries